A9737 |
1992/51225 PART 1 |
Singapore - Relations with India |
19 Jun 1958 - 03 Apr 1985 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 47 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1978 - 1978 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 55 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1980 - 1980 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 56 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1980 - 1981 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 57 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1981 - 1981 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 58 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1981 - 1981 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 14 |
China - Relations with India |
1962 - 1962 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 63 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1981 - 1982 |
A1838 |
3040/11/148 PART 1 |
Philippines - Relations with Pakistan |
1948 - 1975 |
A1838 |
745/1 PART 2 |
Ceylon - Economic Relations with Australia |
1953 - 1955 |
A1838 |
189/11/52 PART 1 |
Pakistan Relations with USSR |
1948 - 1957 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 48 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1978 - 1978 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 54 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1980 - 1980 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 5 |
China - Foreign policy - Relations with India |
1959 - 1959 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 6 |
China - Foreign policy - Relations with India |
1958 - 1959 |
A1838 |
3107/40/149 PART 1 |
China - Relations with Ceylon |
1949 - 1961 |
A1838 |
250/10/7/2 PART 1 |
United States of America - Relations with Pakistan |
1949 - 1956 |
A1838 |
160/7/1 PART 3 |
Ceylon - Foreign Policy - General |
1964 - 1970 |
A1838 |
160/11/147 PART 2 |
Ceylon External Relations - Relations with India |
1952 - 1954 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 20 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1977 - 1978 |
A9421 |
112/3 PART 1 |
Economic - South Africa/Australia - Trade |
Oct 1955 - 11 Dec 1973 |
A1838 |
69/1/4/22 PART 10 |
USSR [Union of Soviet Socialist Republics] - Relations with other countries - India |
1974 - 1977 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 17 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1977 - 1978 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 18 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1976 - 1978 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 19 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1977 - 1978 |
A1838 |
160/11/147 PART 3 |
Ceylon - External relations - Relations with India |
1954 - 1964 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 1 |
Nationalist China - Relations with India |
1946 - 1949 |
A9421 |
112/1 PART 1 |
South Africa - Economic relations - Australia - General |
01 Oct 1973 - 12 Jul 1976 |
A1838 |
201/10/1 PART 41 |
South Africa - Relations with Australia |
1976 - 1976 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 16 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1977 - 1977 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 23 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1979 - 1979 |
A1838 |
774/1 PART 24 |
South Africa - Economic relations with Australia |
1979 - 1981 |
A1838 |
169/11/87 PART 15 |
India - Relations with China |
1962 - 1962 |
A1838 |
169/11/87 PART 20 |
India - Relations with China. |
1962 - 1963 |
A1838 |
766/3/2 |
China - Economic Relations - Ceylon |
1952 - 1970 |
A1838 |
169/11/110 PART 3 |
India - Relations with Indo-China |
1961 - 1970 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 12 |
China - Relations with India |
1962 - 1962 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 13 |
China - Relations with India |
1962 - 1962 |
A1838 |
3107/40/147 PART 16 |
China - Relations with India |
1962 - 1963 |
A6706 |
32 |
India/Pakistan - Various papers |
1958 - 1965 |
AWM121 |
31/F/3 |
Naval Air Power Study |
1973 - 1973 |
AWM121 |
31/F/4 |
Naval Air Power Study - Naptans |
1973 - 1973 |
A1838 |
924/5/1 PART 1 |
United Nations - Economic Problems - Environment & Pollution - General |
1971 - 1972 |
A1838 |
3020/10/6 PART 11 |
North Vietnam - Relations with Australia - Australian representation |
1980 - 1982 |
A1838 |
169/11/87 PART 16 |
India - Relations with China. |
1962 - 1962 |
A1838 |
169/11/148/14 PART 3 |
India - Relations with Pakistan - Troop movements - Minorities - Refugees |
1954 - 1966 |
A1838 |
169/11/87 PART 13 |
India - Relations with Communist China. |
1962 - 1962 |
A1838 |
3020/10/6 PART 10 |
North Vietnam - Relations with Australia - Australian representation |
1979 - 1980 |
A1838 |
924/5/1 PART 2 |
United Nations - Economic Problems - Environment & Pollution - General |
1972 - 1973 |
A1838 |
938/17/7/1 PART 2 |
United Nations - Law of the Sea - Pollution of the Marine Environment - Stockholm Conference on Human Environment |
1971 - 1972 |
A1838 |
938/17/7 PART 10 |
UN - Law of the Sea - Pollution of the Marine Environment |
1974 - 1975 |
A1838 |
25/1/1/3 PART 2 |
France - Monthly Reports from Paris |
1970 - 1974 |
A1838 |
169/11/87 PART 17 |
India - Relations with China. |
1962 - 1962 |
A4090 |
147/1/80 PART 5 |
Defence co-operation programs - General policy |
1974 - 1984 |
A4090 |
723/5/42 PART 2 |
Contingency plans - Papua New Guinea - DGOP-A aspects |
1959 - 1992 |
A4087 |
D154/5/1 PART 1 |
Australian presence in Singapore post April 1975 |
1973 - 1974 |
A4087 |
D188/1/1 |
Intelligence organisation in Papua New Guinea |
1973 - 1974 |
A1838 |
3038/9/1 PART 15 |
Portuguese Timor - Relations with UN |
1981 - 1982 |
A1838 |
280/6/2 PART 3 |
South Pacific Commission - Review Conference |
1956 - 1957 |
A1838 |
280/6/2 PART 2 |
South Pacific Commission - Review Conference |
1956 - 1956 |
A1838 |
3006/4/3 PART 25 |
Indonesia - Relations with Portuguese Timor |
1978 - 1979 |
A1838 |
3006/4/3 PART 26 |
Indonesia - Relations with Portuguese Timor |
1979 - 1980 |
A4940 |
C135 |
Antarctica - Establishment of Australian station |
1950 - 1961 |
M1333 |
5 |
[Personal Papers of Prime Minister Fraser] Heads of Government letters 'U' [J Callaghan and Mrs Margaret Thatcher (United Kingdom)] |
17 Apr 1978 - 26 Oct 1982 |
A1838 |
316/4/3 PART 2 |
Fiji - Social development - Education - University of the South Pacific |
1967 - 1969 |
A1838 |
3006/4/3 PART 27 |
Indonesia - Relations with Portuguese Timor |
1980 - 1980 |
A1838 |
3006/4/3 PART 28 |
Indonesia - Relations with Portuguese Timor |
1980 - 1981 |
A1838 |
3038/9/1 PART 10 |
Portuguese Timor - Relations with UN |
1979 - 1979 |
A1838 |
3038/9/1 PART 13 |
Portuguese Timor - Relations with UN |
1980 - 1981 |
A1838 |
3038/9/1 PART 14 |
Portuguese Timor - Relations with UN |
1981 - 1981 |
A1838 |
277/1/1/14 PART 3 |
South Pacific - Australian interests - 11th South Pacific Forum - Tarawa 1980 |
1980 - 1980 |
A1838 |
277/1/1/14 PART 5 |
South Pacific - Australian interests - 11th South Pacific Forum - Tarawa 1980 |
1980 - 1981 |
A1838 |
277/1/1/14 ANNEX |
South Pacific - Australian interests - 11th South Pacific Forum - Tarawa 1980 |
1980 - 1980 |
A4311 |
723/5 |
Background papers [South Pacific Commission] |
1961 - 1962 |
A1838 |
277/1/1/14 PART 4 |
South Pacific - Australian interests - 11th South Pacific Forum - Tarawa 1980 |
1980 - 1980 |
A1838 |
716/21/35 PART 1 |
Air Transport to and from Economic Commission for Asia & Far East - Conference Lapstone |
1948 - 1948 |
A1838 |
720/10/7/1 PART 2 |
AAEC [Australian Atomic Energy Commission] - Pollution of the seas from disposal of radio active waste includes London Dumping Convention |
1978 - 1980 |
A1838 |
3107/40/52 PART 62 |
China - Relations with USSR |
1972 - 1972 |
A7452 |
A301 |
Briefing of the Prime Minister on intelligence and security matters |
1980 - 1993 |
A1209 |
1981/409 |
Information from Australian security and intelligence organisation [ASIO] on missions of middle Eastern countries in Australia |
1981 - 1981 |
A1209 |
1965/6396 |
Prime Minister's visit overseas, June/July 1965 - Discussions in USA (including press conferences etc) |
1965 - 1965 |
A7452 |
A326 PART 1 |
Refusal of visas to Prof. and Mrs Hidaka |
1981 - 1981 |
A1838 |
277/1/1/14 PART 1 |
South Pacific Australian interests - 11th South Pacific forum - Tarawa 1980 |
1979 - 1980 |
A1838 |
69/1/1/2 PART 2 |
USSR [Union of Soviet Socialist Republics] - Foreign policy - Diplomacy and diplomatic service |
1955 - 1985 |
A1838 |
69/1/4/17 PART 8 |
USSR [Union of Soviet Socialist Republics] - Relations with Indonesia |
1975 - 1986 |
A432 |
1953/3233 |
United Kingdom Claims in the Antarctic |
01 Jan 1800 - 01 Jan 1800 |
A1838 |
69/1/4/38 PART 3 |
USSR [Union of Soviet Socialist Republics] - Relations with South America |
1971 - 1982 |
A7452 |
A105 |
PHCIS Study Group to examine the implications of the judgement in the Munster/Walsh case |
1981 - 1982 |
A12395 |
21 |
Notes kept by Secretary George M Brownbill - Book 21 (annotated Hong Kong 17-19 Nov 75) |
1975 - 1975 |
A7452 |
A73 |
Domestic satellite - intelligence aspects |
1980 - 1983 |
A1838 |
2387/1 |
ASPTAP - New Hebrides - Policy & General |
1965 - 1974 |
A12396 |
1 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 0 (Introduction to the Inventory); Part 1 (Introduction to the Records Part 1 - How the records were created); and Part 2 (Introduction to the Records Part 2 - Outline of the Final Record Structure) |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
6 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 11 (Details of series HF6 and associated series HA1 Submissions, HB Transcripts and HC Exhibits) |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
3 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 3 (Details of Documents in Series HD1 and HD2) - Section 3.2 (B and BB documents from ASIS); Section 3.3 (C documents from Commonwealth Police / Police and Customs); and section 3.4 CD Documents from Defence / JIO / DSD |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
7 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 12 (Details of series HF7); and Part 13 (List of defunct series HF8) |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
8 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 14 (Summaries of 'Records of Conversations' and 'Notes for File' in chronological order) |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
2 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 3 (Details of Documents in Series HD1 and HD2) - Section 3.1 (A and AA documents from ASIO) |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
4 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 4 (Details of briefing material in series HD 5); Part 5 (Details of R documents in series HD6); Part 6 (List of defunct series HF1); and Part 7 (Details of series HF2) |
1977 - 1977 |
A12396 |
9 |
Royal Commission on Intelligence and Security - Inventory of Records - Part 15 (Contents of HB6, HP Collections and HR) and Part 16 (Indexes) |
1977 - 1977 |
A1838 |
716/21/35 PART 3 |
Air Transport to & from Economic Commission for Asia & Far East Conference Lapstone |
1948 - 1948 |